Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maksymilian Ryłło, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1719Born
22 Sep 174223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
15 Nov 175637.1AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
24 Feb 175939.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
24 Mar 178060.5AppointedAdministrator of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
2 Sep 178565.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Nov 179374.1DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Maksymilian Ryłło
Bishop Maksymilian Ryłło O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorosowszczyzna

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,879
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,264
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 274, and Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast