Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Caligari

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1527¹Born
16 Oct 157447.7AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
10 Jul 157750.5ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
9 Apr 157851.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
14 Oct 157952.7AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
10 Jan 158053.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
12 Apr 158154.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
12 Oct 158457.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
1 Jan 158861.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
19 Jan 161386.0DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Caligari (VIAF: 37707653)
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Caligari (born 1527, died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella
Ordained BishopSaint Jean, Church, Warszawa

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 May 2013
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast