Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Russin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1769¹BornTinos
5 Oct 180031.8AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
15 Feb 180132.1Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
14 Sep 182455.7ResignedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
22 Aug 182960.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Russin:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Russin (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013