Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Collaro

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1759BornTinos
16 Mar 181858.7AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
9 Aug 181859.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
3 Jan 182666.5DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Collaro:
Bishop Giovanni Collaro (born , died ) Bishop of Tinos

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013