Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Rubín y Celis

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1712BornValle de Cabuérniga
14 Mar 176855.4AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
26 Jun 176855.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
15 Mar 177360.4AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
9 Aug 178471.8DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Manuel Rubín y Celis:
Bishop Manuel Rubín y Celis (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 85, Number 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150, and Page 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015