Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Fernando Merino

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1712³BornBrozas
1 Dec 176654.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
22 Feb 176754.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
10 Jul 178169.1DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Fernando Merino:
Bishop Miguel Fernando Merino (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 84, Number 426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014