Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Martínez Escalzo

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1704³BornSesma
5 Jun 176561.2AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
11 Aug 176561.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
6 Dec 177369.8DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Martínez Escalzo:
Bishop Juan José Martínez Escalzo (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 83, Number 417
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015