Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Rovetta, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1632BornBrixien
18 Dec 165523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Jun 169360.7AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
14 Jun 169360.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
1 Apr 170471.5ResignedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
14 Apr 171986.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Rovetta:
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Rovetta O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 313
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015