Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Rossetti

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614²Born
16 Sep 164127.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
8 Dec 164127.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
4 May 164329.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faenza, Italy
13 Jul 164329.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 164430.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
18 Aug 165339.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via
9 Mar 165440.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Silvestro in Capite
14 Nov 167258.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Lucina
19 Oct 167662.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
8 Jan 168066.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Nov 168167.8DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rossetti
Carlo Cardinal Rossetti (born 1614, died ) Bishop of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a bishop for 39.9 years
  • a cardinal for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1641, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018