Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Agurto, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544²Born
30 Aug 159551.6AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
3 Aug 159753.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
15 Oct 160864.7DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Agurto (VIAF: 35536169)
Bishop Pedro de Agurto O.S.A. (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopSan Agustin, Church, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,830
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261
  • bp/ob: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast