Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de Ledesma, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
20 Oct 158056.8AppointedBishop of Panamá
3 Jun 158359.4AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
24 Jun 1584²60.4Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
16 Feb 160480.1DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de Ledesma (VIAF: 16487475)
Bishop Bartolomé de Ledesma O.P. (born 1524, died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMieza-Ledesma, Diocese of Salamanca, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Puebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,360
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 95, Number 598
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 111
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast