Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Adam Rieger

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1753Born
19 Dec 177825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
23 Jun 182874.9AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
21 Sep 182875.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
30 Jul 183178.0DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Adam Rieger (VIAF: 89890574)
Bishop Johann Adam Rieger (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrb/Spessart

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018