Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Joseph Rey

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1770BornMégevette, France
25 Apr 179323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
20 Mar 182453.9SelectedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
24 May 182454.1ConfirmedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
1 Aug 182454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
13 Jun 183262.1SelectedBishop of Annecy, France
2 Jul 183262.2ConfirmedBishop of Annecy, France
31 Jan 184271.8DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph Rey:
Bishop Pierre-Joseph Rey (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 77, and Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013