Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simón Antonio de Rentería y Reyes

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1762BornSantoña
1786¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 181956.4SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
29 Mar 181956.6ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
20 Jun 181956.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
30 May 182461.7SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Jul 182461.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
4 Oct 182462.1DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simón Antonio de Rentería y Reyes:
Archbishop Simón Antonio de Rentería y Reyes (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 158, and Page 223
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 138, Number 744

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013