Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenz Barlomiej Ignacy Antoni Raczyński, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1756³BornCzeradzen
15 Apr 178629.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians
24 Jun 178629.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
27 Mar 180952.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 Mar 180952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
20 Aug 180953.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
1821²64.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenz Barlomiej Ignacy Antoni Raczyński
Bishop Lorenz Barlomiej Ignacy Antoni Raczyński O. Cist. (born , died 1821) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 May 2016