Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Marschalk von Pappenheim

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1548SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
5 Oct 1548ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Jan 1549Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
10 Dec 1563DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Marschalk von Pappenheim:
Bishop Georg Marschalk von Pappenheim (died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013