Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincente Puchol Montis

Deceased

Bishop of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1915Born
30 Mar 194530.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 196550.4AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
15 Aug 196550.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
8 May 196752.3DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vincente Puchol Montis
Bishop Vincente Puchol Montis (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018