Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Alessandro Procaccini

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654¹BornPenne
24 Jan 169541.0AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
30 Jan 169541.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
15 Dec 170450.9AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
9 Jun 172268.4DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Alessandro Procaccini:
Bishop Pietro Alessandro Procaccini (born 1654, died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 109, and Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015