Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Prichard, O.F.M. Rec. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669²Born
1687¹18.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
1693²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
20 Sep 171344.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
20 Sep 171344.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
9 Jun 171546.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
20 Nov 174475.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
22 May 175081.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Prichard
Bishop Matthew Prichard O.F.M. Rec. (born 1669, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraig, Penyclawdd, Monmouth, Monmouthshire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestSt. Bonaventure's Friary, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopCologne, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
Death PlacePerthyre, Rockfield, Monmouth, Monmouthshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Kenelm's, Church, Rockfield, Monmouth, Monmouthshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 278
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 173
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 14
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast