Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Gallarati Ghislieri

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Paros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1718BornMilano
19 Oct 176648.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Mar 177253.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
1 Nov 177254.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
1783¹64.4DiedTitular Bishop of Paros

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Gallarati Ghislieri:
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Gallarati Ghislieri (born , died 1783) Titular Bishop of Paros

  • a priest for 16.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 329
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,050
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Dec 2015