Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Portelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

Titular Bishop of Selinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1852Born
1874¹21.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Mar 191158.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
31 Mar 191158.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selinus
14 May 191159.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selinus
19 Jun 192775.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Portelli
Bishop Angelo Portelli O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValletta

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast