Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Pirawski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564¹Born
13 Nov 161753.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
13 Nov 161753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
27 May 161854.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
30 Jul 162561.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Pirawski (VIAF: 89333963)
Bishop Tomasz Pirawski (born 1564, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKazimierz, Poland
Ordained BishopLviv, Archdiocese of Lviv
Death PlaceLviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 15
  • bp/nm/dp: CB, 25 Jan 2018
  • bp/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast