Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Pignatelli

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1659BornMontecorvino
19 Feb 169636.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Feb 169636.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 169636.4AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
8 Apr 169636.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lecce, Italy
12 May 173474.5DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Pignatelli:
Bishop Fabrizio Pignatelli (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1724
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015