Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Macedonio, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1682BornNapoli
30 May 170623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
8 Jun 171835.5AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
12 Jun 171835.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
9 Dec 172745.0DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Macedonio:
Bishop Luigi Maria Macedonio C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013