Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Boncompagni

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1652BornIsola
17 Apr 169037.9AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
7 May 169037.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
12 Dec 169543.5Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169643.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
12 Jun 172472.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
24 Mar 173178.8DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Boncompagni:
Giacomo Cardinal Boncompagni (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a bishop for 40.8 years
  • a cardinal for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015