Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1677Born
1693¹15.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
18 Dec 170023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
8 Jun 171840.7AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
12 Jun 171840.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
17 Aug 171941.9DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carafa
Bishop Giovanni Carafa C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaierà

  • a priest for 18.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast