Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Maria Serio

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1740Born
24 Sep 176322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
9 Aug 180261.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
9 Aug 180261.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
26 Sep 180262.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Maria Serio
Bishop Bernardo Maria Serio (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 64
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast