Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ascanio Piccolomini d’Aragona

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
18 Sep 162832.7AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
12 Nov 162832.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
18 Mar 167175.2ResignedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
14 Sep 167175.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Piccolomini d’Aragona (VIAF: 100576721)
Archbishop Ascanio Piccolomini d’Aragona (born 1596, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopQuirinal Palace, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 312
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: AT, 27 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Mar 2019

Quantcast