Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Marius Joseph Peiris

Auxiliary Bishop of Colombo

Titular Bishop of Tacarata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1941 BornMoratuwa
25 Jan 197230.3Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
16 Nov 200059.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
16 Nov 200059.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacarata
3 Feb 200159.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacarata

MicroData Summary for Vincent Marius Joseph Peiris:
Bishop Vincent Marius Joseph Peiris (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Colombo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Colombo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013