Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst von Schwarzenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1773³BornVienna
12 Jul 180734.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Jul 180734.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 181845.2SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
21 Dec 181845.6ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
14 Mar 181945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
14 Mar 182147.8DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernst von Schwarzenberg:
Bishop Ernst von Schwarzenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 13.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013