Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio-Andrea Pasio

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1781BornSant'Egidio
25 Feb 180422.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 183351.8SelectedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
15 Apr 183351.8ConfirmedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
21 Apr 183351.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
26 Nov 185473.5DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionisio-Andrea Pasio (VIAF: 283813363)
Bishop Dionisio-Andrea Pasio (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1833, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016