Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Panzacchi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1798³BornLoiano
23 Sep 182022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
20 Jan 183435.8AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
26 Jan 183435.9Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
24 Dec 183436.8DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Panzacchi (VIAF: 304916029)
Bishop Bernardino Panzacchi O.F.M. Obs. (born Mar 1798, died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 14.2 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1834, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016