Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacharias Coccopalmieri

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1719BornPescocostanzo
7 Apr 174324.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 177960.0AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
7 Mar 177960.0Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
18 Nov 178465.7DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Zacharias Coccopalmieri:
Bishop Zacharias Coccopalmieri (born , died ) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013