Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Paunet, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1581BornBarbançon, Belgium
24 Sep 160524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Apr 162846.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
21 May 162846.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
31 Mar 163149.6DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Paunet:
Bishop Pierre Paunet O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015