Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marie Malderus (van Malderen)

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1563BornSint-Pieters-Leeuw
25 May 161147.7AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
7 Aug 161147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
21 Oct 163370.1DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Malderus (van Malderen):
Bishop Jean Marie Malderus (van Malderen) (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015