Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Niccolini

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹Born
7 Jun 163259.4AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
13 Jun 163259.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
1 Dec 165178.9DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Niccolini
Archbishop Pietro Niccolini (born 1573, died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 92, Number 551
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast