Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Niccolai

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1779BornValenzatico
12 Jun 180223.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 182950.3AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
2 Aug 182950.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
17 Dec 183253.7DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Niccolai (VIAF: 304914498)
Bishop Ippolito Niccolai (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1829, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016