Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Nassar

Bishop Emeritus of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1960 Born
18 Aug 199029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Sep 200544.9SelectedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Dec 200545.1ConfirmedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Feb 200645.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
30 Jan 201756.2ResignedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Elias Nassar
Bishop Elias Nassar (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saïdā (Sidone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarba

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,061
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017