Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lucio de Morra

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
20 Nov 160637.8AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
26 Nov 160637.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
27 Jun 161748.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
26 Jan 161950.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
1623²54.0DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucio de Morra (VIAF: 10233680)
Archbishop Lucio de Morra (born 1569, died 1623) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSanta Marta, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOtranto, Archdiocese of Otranto

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 39
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 275
  • ob/c2+: AT, 31 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast