Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Abraham Najmy, B.A. †

Deceased

Patriarchal Exarch of United States of America (Melkite Greek)

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1898Born
25 Dec 192628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
27 Jan 196667.7AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of United States of America (Melkite Greek)
27 Jan 196667.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
29 May 196668.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
11 Jun 196870.1DiedPatriarchal Exarch of United States of America (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Justin Abraham Najmy
Bishop Justin Abraham Najmy B.A. (born , died ) Patriarchal Exarch of United States of America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo, Syria
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018