Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignác Nagy de Séllye

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1733³BornSzékesfehérvár
24 Sep 175724.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
17 Dec 175724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
17 Feb 177743.7SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
23 Jun 177744.1ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
27 Jul 177744.2Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
5 Nov 178956.5DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignác Nagy de Séllye:
Bishop Ignác Nagy de Séllye (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015