Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Molinos, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1721BornTórtoles de Esqueva
19 Dec 178564.8AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
26 Feb 178665.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
8 Aug 178665.4DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Angel Molinos:
Bishop Angel Molinos O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 104, Number 539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013