Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Giuseppe Nicola Epifanio Montemagno, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1768Born
18 Dec 179022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
3 Jul 183769.4SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Oct 183769.7ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Oct 183769.7Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
21 Aug 183971.6DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Giuseppe Nicola Epifanio Montemagno
Bishop Ignazio Giuseppe Nicola Epifanio Montemagno O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaltagirone

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 63
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,638
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast