Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gómez de Neva y Frías

Deceased

Bishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666²Born
19 Nov 171448.8AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
19 Jan 171650.0Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
19 Nov 172559.8AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
21 Aug 172963.6DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Gómez de Neva y Frías
Bishop Juan Gómez de Neva y Frías (born 1666, died ) Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCebolla

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 320, and Page 326
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 33, Number 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast