Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Monforte

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1782Born
20 Dec 180624.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 182441.9SelectedBishop of Troia, Italy
3 May 182442.0ConfirmedBishop of Troia, Italy
16 May 182442.0Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
13 Feb 185471.8DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Monforte
Bishop Antonio Monforte (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast