Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Savo (Savio) Cardinal Millini (Mellini)

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1644BornRoma
18 Nov 166824.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 167530.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
17 Jun 167530.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
1681¹36.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Sep 168137.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 168137.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
12 Aug 168642.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
12 Dec 168945.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
17 May 169449.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
10 Feb 170156.5DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Savo (Savio) Millini (Mellini):
Savo (Savio) Cardinal Millini (Mellini) (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a cardinal for 19.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015