Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Vincenzo Lucchesini, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornLucca
28 Nov 168960.9AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
11 Dec 168960.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
13 Apr 169364.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Assisi, Italy
12 Apr 169869.2DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo Lucchesini:
Archbishop Giovanni Vincenzo Lucchesini O.S.M. (born 1629, died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101, and Page 327
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015