Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Friedrich von Breuner

Deceased

Bishop of Wien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1597BornSt. Margarethen
8 Dec 162124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
9 Sep 163033.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
9 Sep 163033.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
5 Sep 163538.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
3 Jun 163941.7SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
5 Sep 163942.0ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
26 Dec 163942.3InstalledBishop of Wien, Austria
22 May 166971.7DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Philipp Friedrich von Breuner:
Bishop Philipp Friedrich von Breuner (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013