Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Spiridon Mattar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1921Born
20 Jul 194625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
22 Jun 197857.3AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Jul 197857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Apr 199069.1ResignedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jul 201493.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Spiridon Mattar
Bishop Spiridon Mattar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlexandria, Egypt
Ordained PriestBeirut, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
Death PlaceBoa Esperanca

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • bp/opd/c1: CB, 19 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017