Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de los Ríos y Armengol, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1720BornPorcuna en Andalucía, Spain
28 May 177049.6AppointedBishop of Panamá
9 Aug 177251.8Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
17 Nov 177656.1DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Francisco de los Ríos y Armengol:
Bishop Francisco de los Ríos y Armengol O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,171
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 89, Number 456
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015